MA S268 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2686
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - New draft substituted, see S2686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - New draft substituted, see S2686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to healthy youth. Education.
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2686 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read second |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 29, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, S2686 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2686 (Replaced by) 2024-02-29 - Reprinted as amended, see S2694
S2694 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2694 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S268 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S268.pdf |