MA S27 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage low-income savings and economic opportunity
Title
Encouraging low-income savings and economic opportunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S27 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9295&generalCourtId=1 |