MA S27 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect private electronic communication, browsing and other activity. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
To protect private electronic communication, browsing and other activity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4578 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H3434 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1672 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H1556 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4323 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4578 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2770 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1672 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H1556 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
H4323 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4578 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2770 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S27 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S27.pdf |