MA S270 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-27 - Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the senior care options program. Elder Affairs.
Title
To improve the senior care options program
Sponsors
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] |
Rep. Marcos Devers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Elder Affairs. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S270 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14110&generalCourtId=1 |