MA S270 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote global trade and economic development through dual language and bi-literacy. Education.
Title
To promote global trade and economic development through dual language and bi-literacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, April 17, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S270 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S270.pdf |