MA S2701 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to changing the name of the Salisbury Beach State Reservation (Senate, No. 2071).
Title
Relative to changing the name of Salisbury Beach State Reservation
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-13 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting (under the last sentence of Rule 7A) for a second reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | New draft (Tarr) of S2071 |
Same As/Similar To
S2071 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2701
H4965 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4966 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4964 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4965 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4966 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4964 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2701 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2701.pdf |