MA S2708 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2014
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to spark the modernization of state heating systems, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2708).
Title
Building environmental justice and energy efficiency with jobs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-22 | Senate | New draft of S2014 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2014 (Replaces) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2708
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4571 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3243 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4571
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H4571 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3243 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4571
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2708 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2708.pdf |