MA S2709 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation for safe, healthy and inclusive elections. Election Laws.
Title
For safe, healthy and inclusive elections
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4762 |
2020-05-18 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4762 (Replaced by) 2020-06-02 - New draft substituted, see H4768
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2709 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2709.pdf |