MA S2728 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S520
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
April 22, 2024 -- The committee on Environment and Natural Resources, to whom was referred the petitions of Jason M. Lewis, John Barrett, III, Jacob R. Oliveira, Thomas M. Stanley and other members of the General Court that provisions be made for an investigation and study by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to establish a protected pollinator habitat, report the accompanying resolve (Senate, No. 2728).
Title
Resolve to protect pollinator habitat
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2024-04-22 | Senate | New draft of S520 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S520 (Replaces) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2728
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2728 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2728.pdf |