MA S2730 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2831
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to deceptive and fraudulent deepfakes in election communications. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to deceptive and fraudulent deepfakes in election communications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2831 |
2024-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-05-22 | House | House concurred |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
2024-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4505 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S591 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
H2709 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied H2935
S2809 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2926
S2831 (Replaced by) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S591 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
H2709 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied H2935
S2809 (Similar To) 2024-07-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2926
S2831 (Replaced by) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2730 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2730.pdf |