MA S278 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4514
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to assist families care for elders. Elder Affairs.
Title
To assist families care for elders.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Rep. Alice Peisch [D] | Sen. Susan Fargo [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4514 |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday, June 30, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4514 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S278 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8056&generalCourtId=1 |