MA S283 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4426
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to carbon monoxide detectors in schools. Education.
Title
Relative to carbon monoxide detectors in schools
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] |
Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4426 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H4426 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H524 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H4426 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S283.pdf |