MA S2838 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the position of treasurer collector in the town of Lakeville. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the position of treasurer collector in the town of Lakeville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2021-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-12-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-07-24 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2838 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2838.pdf |