MA S2839 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Harvard to establish a cap on property taxes for means tested senior citizens. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing the town of Harvard to establish a cap on property taxes for means tested senior citizens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2020 from 04:30 PM-06:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday October 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday September 18, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-24 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2839 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2839.pdf |