MA S285 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Pending: Senate Ethics and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to promote prescription pharmaceutical affordability in the Commonwealth. Elder Affairs.
Title
Establishing a special commission to promote prescription pharmaceutical affordability in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to Joint Committee on Rules |
2011-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Elder Affairs. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S285 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10849&generalCourtId=1 |