MA S287 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a discretionary grant program for students with autism. Education.
Title
To establish a discretionary grant program for students with autism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2348 |
2017-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1221 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S646 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2209
S331 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S608 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1106 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H2209 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1980 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H227 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
H500 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied H2955
S2348 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S646 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2209
S331 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S608 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1106 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
H2209 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1980 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
H227 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
H500 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied H2955
S2348 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S287 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S287.pdf |