MA S2894 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of New Bedford to grant a utility easement to the University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth
Title
Authorizing the city of New Bedford to grant a utility easement to the University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #248 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #248 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2024-08-01 | House | Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 198 ) |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2024-08-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-31 | House | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted |
2024-07-31 | House | Read second |
2024-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2024-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting the text of H4962 |
2024-07-29 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-07-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2412 |
2024-07-25 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2412 |
2024-07-25 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3935 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2024-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2894
H4201 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4954 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4962 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Adopted
S2412 (Similar To) 2024-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2894
H4201 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4954 (Similar To) 2024-09-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4962 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2894 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2894.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/193/SenateRollCall248.pdf |