MA S2907 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Middleborough to lease to the town of Plympton land owned by Middleborough and located in Plympton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Middleborough to lease to the town of Plympton land owned by Middleborough and located in Plympton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-09-14 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2907 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2907.pdf |