MA S2922 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S569
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to provide for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to mattress recycling, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2922).
Title
To assess the future of mattress recycling in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-16 | Senate | New draft of S569 and S570 |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S569 (Replaces) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2922
S408 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S136 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H2231
S570 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2922
S2582 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H4441
S408 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S136 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H2231
S570 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2922
S2582 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied H4441
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2922.pdf |