MA S2956 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2979
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Reprinted as amended, see S2979
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Reprinted as amended, see S2979
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to archaic laws
Title
Relative to archaic laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #191 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2979 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S930 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rausch) rejected |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S930 |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S2979 (Replaces) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3637 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1110 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2979 (Replaces) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3637 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1110 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2956 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2956.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall191.pdf |