MA S2997 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To expand access to high-quality, affordable early education and care
Title
To expand access to high-quality, affordable early education and care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #202 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Text of S2973, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2883 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
S2973 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2997
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S2973 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2997
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2997 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2997.pdf |