MA S308 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair election in Massachusetts. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to fair election in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Alice Wolf [D] | Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
Rep. Ellen Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2364 |
2011-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2011 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Election Laws. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2364 (Replaced by) 2012-07-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S308 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14807&generalCourtId=1 |