MA S3132 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to supported decision-making agreements for certain adults with disabilities (Senate, No. 2848),- reports recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 3132).
Title
Relative to supported decision-making agreements for certain adults with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-11-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Substituted for S2848 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2848 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S124 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2848
S2848 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - New draft substituted, see S3132
H272 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4725
S2848 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - New draft substituted, see S3132
H272 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4725
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3132 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3132.pdf |