MA S3138 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S3125
Note: Legislation replaced by S3158
Note: Legislation replaced by S3158
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to real property in Lowell, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 3138).
Title
Relative to real property in Lowell
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | Sen. Edward Kennedy [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Rady Mom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted |
2022-12-22 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S3158 |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Read second |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S3158 |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-11-14 | Senate | New draft of S3125 |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S3125 (Replaces) 2022-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3138
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S970 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1006 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S3158 (Replaced by) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2022
S2030 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2016 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S970 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1006 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S3158 (Replaced by) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2022
S2030 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2016 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3138 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3138.pdf |