MA S317 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow citizens seventeen (17) years of age to vote in the City of Lowell municipal elections. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Allowing citizens seventeen (17) years of age to vote in the City of Lowell municipal elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-10-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S317 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S317.pdf |