MA S339 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote alternative dispute resolution for students. Education.
Title
To promote alternative dispute resolution for students
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
H1500 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3432 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S969 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S329 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4218 (Similar To) 2020-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2020
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S137 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Accompanied S125
H1500 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3432 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S969 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S329 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4218 (Similar To) 2020-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2020
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S339 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S339.pdf |