MA S342 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2259
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure the vitality of Moore State Park in the town of Paxton. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To ensure the continued vitality of Moore State Park in the town of Paxton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2259 |
2011-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2259 (Replaced by)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S342 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14680&generalCourtId=1 |