MA S35 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H114
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Accompanied H114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Accompanied H114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation regarding pathways to family economic self-sufficiency . Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Regarding pathways to family economic self-sufficiency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Accompanied H114 |
2013-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H114 (Replaced by) 2014-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S35 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S35.pdf |