MA S351 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2535
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to home care cost sharing. Elder Affairs.
Title
Regarding home care cost sharing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2535 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S352 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
S343 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S364 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H341 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2068 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
S343 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S364 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H341 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2068 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H3821 (Similar To) 2017-11-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2017
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S351 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S351.pdf |