MA S364 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the public health of citizens through the testing and labeling of Striped Bass. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Promoting the public health of citizens through the testing and labeling of Striped Bass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-19 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2012-02-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S364 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13803&generalCourtId=1 |