MA S368 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2399
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize voter registration and jury pool lists. Election Laws.
Title
To modernize voter registration and jury pool lists
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2399 |
2017-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S801 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S389 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S704 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H929 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1009 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H760 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2673 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1206 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H928 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4266 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S389 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S704 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H929 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1009 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H760 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2673 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1206 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1208 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H928 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4266 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S368 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S368.pdf |