MA S37 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2186
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Accompanied S2186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Accompanied S2186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to remove the welfare benefit cap for children conceived while a family is receiving assistance. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to well-being and care of a child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Accompanied S2186 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-03-05 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2019-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 02:45 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 11:30 AM-02:45 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H328 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3433 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2186 (Replaced by) 2019-03-28 - Substituted as a new text for H3594
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
H3352 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3435 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3433 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S872 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2186 (Replaced by) 2019-03-28 - Substituted as a new text for H3594
H132 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
H3471 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2227 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2368 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
S2377 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - See H4012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S37 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S37.pdf |