MA S38 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission on two-generation approaches to childhood education. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Establishing a special commission on two-generation approaches to childhood education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2017-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/17 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S304 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S208 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1303 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1255 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H3200 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2075 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H291 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S208 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1303 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1255 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H3200 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2075 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H291 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S38 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S38.pdf |