MA S38 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote asset building for low income residents. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To promote asset building for low income residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2722 |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H102 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1305 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2722 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H102 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1305 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2722 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S38 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S38.pdf |