MA S382 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4537
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect children from toxic toys. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To protect children from bisphenol-A.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Spilka [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Rep. Frank Smizik [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
Rep. Denise Andrews [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4537 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2011 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4537 (Replaced by) 2012-12-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S382 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13869&generalCourtId=1 |