MA S383 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2399
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to voter information privacy. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to voter information privacy
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2399 |
2017-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S991 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2320
S886 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S100 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S885 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
S943 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1936 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S269 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H3698 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
S886 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S100 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S885 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
S943 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1936 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2484
S269 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H3698 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S383.pdf |