MA S404 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4472
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen emergency preparedness for home care workers. Elder Affairs.
Title
To strengthen emergency preparedness for home care workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4472 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1148 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H748 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H536 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
H2414 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1521 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S282 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S1207 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S891 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5268
H4472 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2740 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2839
H4471 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H756 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
S1148 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H748 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
H536 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
H2414 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1521 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S282 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S1207 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S891 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5268
H4472 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2740 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2839
H4471 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H756 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4472
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S404 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S404.pdf |