MA S405 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to water resource impacts. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To mitigate water resource impacts
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Louis Kafka [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] |
Rep. James Arciero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2380 |
2015-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2380 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S945 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1837 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S442 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S323 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2511 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 403 of the Acts of 2016
S945 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1837 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S442 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S323 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2511 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 403 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S405 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S405.pdf |