MA S42 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2570
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen local food systems. Agriculture.
Title
Strengthening local food systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2570 |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1410 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
S2570 (Replaced by) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4375 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4493 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4717 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2570 (Replaced by) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4375 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4493 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4717 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S42 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S42.pdf |