MA S431 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H303
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-27 - Accompanied H303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-27 - Accompanied H303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to lending
Title
Relative to lending
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | House | Accompanied H303 |
2011-12-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H303 (Replaced by) 2011-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 115 of the Acts of 2011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S431 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14505&generalCourtId=1 |