MA S434 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to reviving and continuing the special commission established (under Chapter 498 of the Acts of 2008) to make an investigation and study of the water quality of the Charles River. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Charles River water quality commission
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2017-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S452 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S456 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2465
S1226 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2135 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2139 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4987 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S456 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2465
S1226 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2135 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2139 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4987 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S434 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S434.pdf |