MA S435 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the licensure of insurance adjusters in the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the licensure of insurance adjusters in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-28 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2013 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S435 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S435.pdf |