MA S44 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S50
Note: Legislation replaced by H3189
Note: Legislation replaced by H3189
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - See H3189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - See H3189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state personnel”; and by striking out the emergency preamble and inserting in place thereof the following emergency preamble:- “Whereas, The deferred operation of this act would tend to defeat its purpose, which is to provide forthwith for a fair and orderly manner in which the number of executive department employees may be reduced in order to decrease expenditures by the commonwealth, therefore it is hereby declared to be an emergency law, necessary for the immediate preservation of the public convenience.”
Title
Providing for an employee retirement incentive program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | See H3189 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Substituted as a new text for H3189 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S50 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Spilka) adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Chang-Diaz) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Keenan) adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Keenan) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Rush) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Donnelly) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Rodrigues) rejected |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Donoghue) adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Moore) rejected |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommended new text for H3189 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S50 (Replaces) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3189 (Replaced by) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H2215 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S2183 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
S210 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S579 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H3189 (Replaced by) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H2215 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S2183 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
S210 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S579 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S44 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S44.pdf |