MA S443 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Accompanied S570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Accompanied S570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce disposable plastic straw waste. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To combat disposable plastic straw waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Accompanied S570 |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S570 (Replaced by) 2024-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2830
S2723 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2830 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2833
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S570 (Replaced by) 2024-06-20 - New draft substituted, see S2830
S2723 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2830 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2833
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S443 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S443.pdf |