MA S444 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide equal access to service animal trainers. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To provide equal access to service animal trainers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S735 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Reported by S2407
S1144 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H147 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H1589 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S643 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1144 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H147 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H1589 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S643 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S444 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S444.pdf |