MA S46 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an electronic backpack for foster children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Creating an electronic backpack for foster children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3439 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S889 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S854 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S1048 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3439 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S889 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S854 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S1048 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S46 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S46.pdf |