MA S469 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the feasibility of mobile voting for active-duty service members, voters with disabilities and municipalities. Election Laws.
Title
Relative to the feasibility of mobile voting for active-duty service members, voters with disabilities and municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2443 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H842 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2584 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3363 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3692 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S573 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H842 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2584 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S82 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4313 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 72 of the Acts of 2022
S3088 (Similar To) 2022-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2022
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1910 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied S1883
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3363 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3692 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S469 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S469.pdf |