MA S475 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3152
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - New draft substituted, see S3152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - New draft substituted, see S3152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support working parents who choose to run for public office. Election Laws.
Title
Supporting parents running for public office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S3152 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Read second |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 10, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H769 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
H1590 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4460
H2876 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
S1946 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S317 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S1878 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3152 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1590 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H244 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4460
H2876 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
S1946 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S317 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S1878 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3152 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S475 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S475.pdf |