MA S483 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2286
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate pharmacy audits. Financial Services.
Title
Regulating pharmacy audits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2286 |
2014-07-09 | House | House concurred |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2286 (Replaced by) 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 441 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S483 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S483.pdf |