MA S494 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2064
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S2064
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S2064
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make habilitative services available to the children of the Commonwealth. Financial Services.
Title
To make habilitative services available to the children of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2064 |
2013-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2064 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S494 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S494.pdf |